Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1 to SA 2 and SA 2, pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Executive Session Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 11, 2023, 1:00 p.m., Senate Committee Room 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 139 NOES: 16 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Perfected (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
HCS Adopted (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Re-referred to Committee: Local Government(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Referred: General Laws(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2023
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Introduced and Read First Time (H)
|
|
|