House | 05/08/2023 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Action Postponed (H) | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Executive Session Continued | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Referred: Emerging Issues(H) | ||
House | 01/24/2023 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/23/2023 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |