House | 04/12/2023 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/02/2023 | Referred: General Laws(H) | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/24/2023 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |