House | 05/10/2023 | Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H) | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Referred: Rules - Regulatory Oversight(H) | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Referred: Rural Community Development(H) | ||
House | 01/26/2023 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |