House | 05/08/2023 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Referred: Health and Mental Health Policy(H) | ||
House | 01/05/2023 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/04/2023 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 12/01/2022 | Prefiled (H) |