Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Motion to Do Pass Failed (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Executive Session Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 18, 2023, 2:00 p.m., Senate Committee Room 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Second read and referred: Emerging Issues(S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 96 NOES: 56 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Perfected (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred: Government Efficiency and Downsizing(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Introduced and Read First Time (H)
|
|
|