Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Executive Session Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 25, 2023, 8:30 a.m., Senate Committee Room 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Second read and referred: Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources(S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 108 NOES: 28 PRESENT: 13
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 4 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Referred: Fiscal Review(H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
HCS Adopted (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Referred: Rules - Regulatory Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred: Rural Community Development(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2023
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2023
|
Read First Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
12/01/2022
|
Prefiled (H)
|
|
|