Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Executive Session Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Executive Session Scheduled - Monday, May 8, 2023, 1:00 p.m., Senate Lounge
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 19, 2023, 8:00 a.m., Senate Lounge
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Second read and referred: General Laws(S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 102 NOES: 37 PRESENT: 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 4 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Referred: Fiscal Review(H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Perfected (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
HCS Adopted (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Referred: Special Committee on Tax Reform(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2023
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2023
|
Read First Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
12/21/2022
|
Prefiled (H)
|
|
|