Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Executive Session Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, May 10, 2023, 9:30 a.m., Senate Committee Room 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S)
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 102 NOES: 42 PRESENT: 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 3 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Referred: Fiscal Review(H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred: Special Committee on Public Policy(H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Introduced and Read First Time (H)
|
|
|