House
|
05/12/2023
|
H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Bill will hold its place on Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
HA 2 to HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Christ)--(0466H12.06H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
HA 1 to HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Lovasco)--(0466H12.05H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
HA 1 to HCS H offered (Christofanelli)--(0466H12.04H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Referred H Fiscal Review Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
HCS Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Government Accountability
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
HCS Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Government Accountability
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Hearing Conducted H Special Committee on Government Accountability
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Referred H Special Committee on Government Accountability
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
H Second Read
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
H First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
S Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Perfected
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
SA 1 to SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
SA 1 to SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Eigel)--(0466S07.06S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Brattin)--(0466S07.05S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
SS for SCS S offered (Eigel)--(0466S.07F)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Reported from S Veterans, Military Affairs and Pensions Committee w/SCS
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2023
|
SCS Voted Do Pass S Veterans, Military Affairs and Pensions Committee (0466S.05C)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Hearing Conducted S Veterans, Military Affairs and Pensions Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
Second Read and Referred S Veterans, Military Affairs and Pensions Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2023
|
S First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2022
|
Prefiled
|
|
|