Senate | 03/01/2023 | Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Hearing Cancelled S General Laws Committee | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Re-referred S General Laws Committee | ||
Senate | 01/19/2023 | Second Read and Referred S Governmental Accountability Committee | ||
Senate | 01/04/2023 | S First Read | ||
Senate | 12/01/2022 | Prefiled |