Senate
|
07/06/2023
|
Signed by Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Signed by House Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
CCS H Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
H adopts CCR
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
CCS S Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
CCR S offered & adopted (Bean)
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
H distributes CCR--(0697S.04S)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Senate conferees appointed: Bean, Hoskins, Trent, Williams, Razer
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
House conferees appointed: Griffith, Boyd, Seitz, Smith (46), Nickson-Clark
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
H refuses to recede and grants conference
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
S refuses to concur in HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, HA 4, HA 5, HA 6, HA 7, HA 1 to HA 8, HA 8 as amended, HA 9, HA 1 to HA 11, HA 2 to HA 11, HA 11 as amended, HA 1 to HA 12, HA 12 as amended, HA 1 to HA 13, HA 2 to HA 13, HA 13 as amended, HA 14, HA 15 & HA 16 and requests H recede or grant conference
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
H Third Read and Passed, as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
HA 16 H offered & adopted (Windham)--(0697S02.19H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
HA 15 H offered & adopted (Smith-46)--(0697S02.32H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
HA 14 H offered & adopted (Nickson-Clark)--(0697S02.14H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
HA 13, as amended, H adopted --(0697S02.37H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
HA 2 to HA 13 H offered & adopted (Weber)--(0697S02.57H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
HA 1 to HA 13 H offered & adopted (Bosley)--(0697S02.54H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
HA 13 H offered (Anderson)--(0697S02.37H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
HA 12, as amended, H adopted --(0697S02.27H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
HA 1 to HA 12 H offered & adopted (Wright)--(0697S02.53H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
HA 12 H offered (Francis)--(0697S02.27H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
HA 11, as amended, H adopted --(0697S02.40H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
HA 3 to HA 11 H offered & withdrawn (Knight)--(0697S02.52H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
HA 2 to HA 11 H offered & adopted (Gregory)--(0697S02.45H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
HA 1 to HA 11 H offered & adopted (Baker)--(0697S02.44H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
HA 11 to H offered (Schwadron)--(0697S02.40H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
HA 10 H offered & withdrawn (Burger)--(0697S02.16H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
HA 9 H offered & adopted (Davis)--(0697S02.10H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
HA 8, as amended, H adopted --(0697S02.01H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
HA 1 to HA 8 H offered & adopted (Byrnes)--(0697S02.41H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
HA 8 H offered (Seitz)--(0697S02.01H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
HA 7 H offered & adopted (Haley)--(0697S02.39H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
HA 6 H offered & adopted (Cook)--(0697S02.04H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
HA 5 H offered & adopted (Christ)--(0697S02.15H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
HA 4 H offered & adopted (Dinkins)--(0697S02.03H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
HA 3 H offered & adopted (Morse)--(0697S02.18H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
HA 2 H offered & adopted (Seitz)--(0697S02.05H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
HA 1 H offered & adopted (Boyd)--(0697S02.07H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported Do Pass H Veterans
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Voted Do Pass H Veterans
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Hearing Conducted H Veterans
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Referred H Veterans
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
H Second Read
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
H First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
S Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Perfected
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
SS S offered & adopted (Bean)--(0697S.02F)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Reported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2023
|
S First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2022
|
Prefiled
|
|
|