LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Missouri MO
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB16
Action History
MO
Missouri Senate Bill SB16
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Missouri 2023 Regular Session
Missouri Senate Bill SB16
Action History
Senate
02/06/2023
Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee
Senate
01/23/2023
Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Local Government and Elections Committee
Senate
01/12/2023
Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee
Senate
01/04/2023
S First Read
Senate
12/01/2022
Prefiled