Senate | 05/12/2023 | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | SA 5 S offered & adopted (Black)--(0731S01.08S) | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | SA 4 S offered & adopted (Black)--(0731S01.07S) | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | SA 3 S offered & adopted (Luetkemeyer)--(0731S01.06S) | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | SA 2 S offered & adopted (Gannon)--(0731S01.05S) | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | SA 1 S withdrawn | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | SA 1 to SA 1 S offered (Eigel)--(0731S01.09S) | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | SA 1 S offered (Razer)--(0731S01.02S) | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Reported from S Local Government and Elections Committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee | ||
Senate | 01/04/2023 | S First Read | ||
Senate | 12/01/2022 | Prefiled |