House
|
05/12/2023
|
S Bills with H Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
H Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
HCS, as amended, H adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (McGaugh)--(1166H07.17H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Murphy)--(1166H07.14H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Thompson)--(1166H07.18H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Davidson)--(1166H07.19H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Owen)--(1166H07.21H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Christofanelli)--(1166H07.20H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Henderson)--(1166H07.10H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
HCS Reported Do Pass H Insurance Policy
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
HCS Voted Do Pass H Insurance Policy
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Hearing Conducted H Insurance Policy
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Referred H Insurance Policy
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
H Second Read
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
H First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
S Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Perfected
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
SS S offered & adopted (Crawford)--(1166S.05F)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Reported from S Insurance and Banking Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Voted Do Pass S Insurance and Banking Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Hearing Conducted S Insurance and Banking Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Second Read and Referred S Insurance and Banking Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2023
|
S First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2022
|
Prefiled
|
|
|