Senate | 05/12/2023 | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | SA 1 to SCS S offered (Eigel)--(0311S03.04S) | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Reported from S Governmental Accountability Committee w/SCS | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability Committee (0311S.03C) | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability Committee | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Re-referred S Governmental Accountability Committee | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Hearing Cancelled S Progress and Development Committee | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Second Read and Referred S Progress and Development Committee | ||
Senate | 01/04/2023 | S First Read | ||
Senate | 12/01/2022 | Prefiled |