Senate
|
07/06/2023
|
Signed by Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Signed by House Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
S concurs in HCS, as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
S Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
H Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
HCS, as amended, H adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
HA 9 to HCS H offered & adopted (Toalson Reisch)--(1080H08.08H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
HA 8 to HCS H offered & adopted (Shields)--(1080H08.14H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Thompson)--(1080H08.23H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Henderson)--(1080H08.22H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Kelly-141)--(1080H08.18H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Stinnett)--(1080H08.13H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Copeland)--(1080H08.10H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Schwadron)--(1080H08.20H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Kelly-141)--(1080H08.17H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
HCS Reported Do Pass H Crime Prevention and Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
HCS Voted Do Pass H Crime Prevention and Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Hearing Conducted H Crime Prevention and Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Referred H Crime Prevention and Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
H Second Read
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
H First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Perfected
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
SS S offered & adopted (Hough)--(1080S.04F)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Reported from S Insurance and Banking Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Voted Do Pass S Insurance and Banking Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
Hearing Conducted S Insurance and Banking Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2023
|
Second Read and Referred S Insurance and Banking Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2023
|
S First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2022
|
Prefiled
|
|
|