Senate
|
07/06/2023
|
Signed by Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Signed by House Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
CCS H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
H adopts CCR
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
CCS S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
CCR S offered & adopted (Brown (16))
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
S distributes CCS--(0495S.04S)
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
H distributes CCR/CCS--(0495S.04S)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
S conferees appointed: Brown-16, Bernskoetter, Cierpiot, Williams, Razer
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
House conferees appointed: Roberts, Perkins, Copeland, Anderson, Burton
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
H refuses to recede and grants conference
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
S refuses to concur in HA 2, HA 3, HA 4, HA 5, HA 6, HA 7, HA 8, HA 1 to HSA 1 for HA 9, HSA 1 for HA 9, as amended, HA 1 to HA 10, HA 10, as amended, HA 1 to HA 11, HA 2 to HA 11, HA 3 to HA 11 & HA 11, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
H Third Read and Passed, as amended - EC adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
HA 11, as amended, H adopted--(0495S01.25H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
HA 3 to HA 11 H offered & adopted (Cook)--(0495S01.41H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
HA 2 to HA 11 H offered & adopted (Dinkins)--(0495S01.40H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
HA 1 to HA 11 H offered & adopted (Bosley)--(0495S01.43H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
HA 11 H offered (Hovis)--(0495S01.25H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
HA 10, as amended, H adopted--(0495S01.31H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
HA 1 to HA 10 H offered & adopted (Boyd)--(0495S01.42H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
HA 10 H offered (Falkner)--(0495S01.31H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
HSA 1 for HA 9, as amended, H adopted--(0495S01.37H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
HA 1 to HSA 1 for HA 9 H offered & adopted (McGaugh)--(0495S01.39H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
HSA 1 for HA 9 H offered (Kelly-141)--(0495S01.37H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
HA 9 H offered (Christofanelli)--(0495S01.17H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
HA 8 H offered & adopted (Diehl)--(0495S01.16H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
HA 7 H offered & adopted (Evans)--(0495S01.28H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
HA 6 H offered & adopted (Francis)--(0495S01.32H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
HA 5 H offered & adopted (Copeland)--(0495S01.24H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
HA 4 H offered & adopted (Veit)--(0495S01.23H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
HA 3 H offered & adopted (Baker)--(0495S01.29H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
HA 2 H offered & adopted (Baker)--(0495S01.11H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
HA 1 H offered & withdrawn (Dinkins)--(0495S01.15H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported Do Pass H Crime Prevention and Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Voted Do Pass H Crime Prevention and Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Hearing Conducted H Crime Prevention and Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Referred H Crime Prevention and Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
H Second Read
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
H First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
S Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Perfected
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Reported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2023
|
Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2023
|
Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2023
|
S First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2022
|
Prefiled
|
|
|