House
|
04/24/2023
|
HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
HCS Reported Do Pass H Economic Development
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
HCS Voted Do Pass H Economic Development
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Hearing Conducted H Economic Development
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Referred H Economic Development
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
H Second Read
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
H First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
S Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2023
|
Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2023
|
Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
Perfected
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (May)--(0363S05.03S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Roberts)--(0363S05.02S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
SS for SCS S offered (Hoskins)--(0363S.05F)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Reported from S Economic Development and Tax Policy Committee w/SCS
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SBs 3 & 69) Economic Development and Tax Policy Committee (0363S.03C)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2023
|
Hearing Conducted S Economic Development and Tax Policy Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2023
|
Second Read and Referred S Economic Development and Tax Policy Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2023
|
S First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2022
|
Prefiled
|
|
|