House
|
07/06/2023
|
Signed by Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
Delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
Signed by House Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
H Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported Do Pass H General Laws
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Voted Do Pass H General Laws
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Hearing Conducted H General Laws
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Referred H General Laws
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
H Second Read
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
H First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
S Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Perfected, as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
SA 1 S offered & adopted (Arthur)--(0388S02.01S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Reported from S Education and Workforce Development Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Voted Do Pass S Education and Workforce Development Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Hearing Conducted S Education and Workforce Development Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2023
|
Second Read and Referred S Education and Workforce Development Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2023
|
S First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2022
|
Prefiled
|
|
|