Senate | 05/12/2023 | Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Reported from S Governmental Accountability Committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability Committee | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability Committee | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Hearing Cancelled S Governmental Accountability Committee | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Second Read and Referred S Governmental Accountability Committee | ||
Senate | 01/04/2023 | S First Read | ||
Senate | 12/08/2022 | Prefiled |