Senate
|
07/06/2023
|
Signed by Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Signed by House Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
S concurs in HCS, as amended (Schroer)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
H Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
HCS, as amended, H adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Francis)--(1413H07.15H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Henderson)--(1413H07.04H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Knight)--(1413H07.16H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
S Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Referred H Fiscal Review Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
HCS Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Public Policy
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
HCS Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Public Policy
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Hearing Conducted H Special Committee on Public Policy
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Referred H Special Committee on Public Policy
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
H Second Read
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
H First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Perfected
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Fitzwater)--(1413S06.02S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
SS for SCS S offered (Schroer)--(1413S.06F)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Reported from S Emerging Issues Committee w/SCS
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
SCS Voted Do Pass S Emerging Issues Committee (1413S.04C)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Hearing Conducted S Emerging Issues Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Second Read and Referred S Emerging Issues Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2023
|
S First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/29/2022
|
Prefiled
|
|
|