House | 05/12/2023 | H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Reported Do Pass H Health and Mental Health Policy | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Voted Do Pass H Health and Mental Health Policy | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Hearing Conducted H Health and Mental Health Policy | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Referred H Health and Mental Health Policy | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | H Second Read | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | H First Read | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | S Third Read and Passed | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Perfected | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Thompson Rehder)--(0719S.04F) | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Reported from S Governmental Accountability Committee w/SCS | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability Committee (0719S.02C) | ||
Senate | 01/26/2023 | Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability Committee | ||
Senate | 01/12/2023 | Second Read and Referred S Governmental Accountability Committee | ||
Senate | 01/04/2023 | S First Read | ||
Senate | 12/01/2022 | Prefiled |