Senate | 05/12/2023 | Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Reported from S Local Government and Elections Committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee | ||
Senate | 01/04/2023 | S First Read | ||
Senate | 12/30/2022 | Prefiled |