Senate | 05/12/2023 | Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Reported from S Governmental Accountability Committee | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability Committee | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability Committee | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Second Read and Referred S Governmental Accountability Committee | ||
Senate | 01/04/2023 | S First Read | ||
Senate | 01/03/2023 | Prefiled |