Senate
|
07/06/2023
|
Signed by Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Signed by House Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
CCS H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
H adopts CCR
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
H distributes CCR/CCS--(0453S.10S)
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
CCS S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
CCR S offered & adopted (Gannon)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
S conferees appointed: Gannon, Coleman, Thompson Rehder, McCreery, Arthur
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
House conferees appointed: Stinnett, Kelly(141), Haden, Crossley, Baringer
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
H refuses to recede and grants conference
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
HCS, as amended, H adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
HA 10 to HCS H offered & adopted (Perkins)--(0453H07.26H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
HA 9 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hardwick)--(0453H07.22H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
HA 8 to HCS H offered & adopted (Davidson)--(0453H07.40H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Busick)--(0453H07.28H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
HA 6 to HCS, as amended, H adopted--(0453H07.12H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
HA 5 to HA 6 to HCS H offered & defeated (Mann)--(0453H07.61H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
HA 4 to HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Lewis)--(0453H07.63H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
HA 3 to HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Cook)--(0453H07.64H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
HA 2 to HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Haden)--(0453H07.49H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
HA 1 to HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Murphy)--(0453H07.48H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
HA 6 to HCS H offered (Shields)--(0453H07.12H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
HA 5 to HCS, as amended, H adopted--(0453H07.39H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
HA 2 to HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Bosley)--(0453H07.59H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
HA 1 to HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Nickson-Clark)--(0453H07.53H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
HA 5 to HCS H offered (Kelly-141)--(0453H07.39H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
HA 4 to HCS, as amended, H adopted--(0453H07.18H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
HA 1 to HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Dinkins)--(0453H07.45H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
HA 4 to HCS H offered (Henderson)--(0453H07.18H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
HA 3 to HCS, as amended H adopted--(0453H07.10H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
HA 1 to HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (McGaugh)--(0453H07.35H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
HA 3 to HCS H offered (Riley)--(0453H07.10H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Stinnett)--(0453H07.20H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Stinnett)--(0453H07.27H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
HCS Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
HCS Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred H Fiscal Review Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
HCS Reported Do Pass H General Laws
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
HCS Voted Do Pass H General Laws
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Hearing Conducted H General Laws
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Referred H General Laws
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
H Second Read
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
H First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Perfected
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Thompson Rehder)--(0453S06.08S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
SS for SCS S offered (Gannon)--(0453S.06F)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Reported from S Health and Welfare Committee w/SCS
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2023
|
SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SBs 45 & 90) Health and Welfare Committee (0453S.02C)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2023
|
Hearing Conducted S Health and Welfare Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2023
|
Second Read and Referred S Health and Welfare Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2023
|
S First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2022
|
Prefiled
|
|
|