Senate
|
07/06/2023
|
Signed by Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Signed by House Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
S concurs in HCS, as amended (Black)
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
S Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
H Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
HCS, as amended, H adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
HA 8 to HCS H offered & adopted (Gregory)--(0673H07.16H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Pollitt)--(0673H07.12H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Steinhoff)--(0673H07.11H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (O'Donnell)--(0673H07.15H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (R. Brown)--(0673H07.14H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Roberts)--(0673H07.04H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hovis)--(0673H07.10H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hovis)--(0673H07.05H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
HCS Reported Do Pass H Pensions
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
HCS Voted Do Pass H Pensions
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Hearing Conducted H Pensions
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Referred H Pensions
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
H Second Read
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
H First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Perfected
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
SS, as amended, S adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
SA 2 to SS S offered & adopted (Arthur)--(0673S05.02S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
SA 1 to SS S offered & adopted (Razer)--(0673S05.05S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
SS S offered (Black)-(0673S.05F)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Reported from S Veterans, Military Affairs and Pensions Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Voted Do Pass S Veterans, Military Affairs and Pensions Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2023
|
Hearing Conducted S Veterans, Military Affairs and Pensions Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2023
|
Second Read and Referred S Veterans, Military Affairs and Pensions Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2023
|
S First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2022
|
Prefiled
|
|
|