Senate | 05/12/2023 | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | SA 2 to SS S offered (Schroer)--(0766S02.03S) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | SA 1 to SS S offered & adopted (Luetkemeyer)--(0766S02.01S) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | SS S offered (Koenig)--(0766S.02F) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Reported from S General Laws Committee | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Hearing Cancelled S General Laws Committee | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Re-referred S General Laws Committee | ||
Senate | 01/19/2023 | Second Read and Referred S Governmental Accountability Committee | ||
Senate | 01/04/2023 | S First Read | ||
Senate | 12/01/2022 | Prefiled |