House
|
05/12/2023
|
Requests to Recede Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Senate Message on SS#2 for SCS for SB 96, with HS for HCS, as amended refused by House
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Substitute Motion: S refuses to concur in HS for HCS, as amended and requests H recede and take up & pass bill S adopted (Koenig)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Motion to concur in HS for HCS, as amended S (Koenig)
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
H distributes CCR/CCS--(0917S.18S)
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Senate conferees appointed: Koenig, Coleman, Trent, Beck, McCreery
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
House conferees appointed: Baker, Murphy, Keathley, Ingle, Butz
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
H refuses to recede and grants conference
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
S refuses to concur in HS for HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
H Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
HS for HCS, as amended, H adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
HSA 1 for HA 4 to HS for HCS H offered & adopted (McGaugh)--(0917H12.32H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
HA 4 to HS for HCS H offered (Wilson)--(0917H12.15H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
HA 3 to HS for HCS H offered & withdrawn (McGaugh)--(0917H12.12H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
HA 2 to HS for HCS H offered & withdrawn (Mayhew)--(0917H12.10H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
HA 1 to HS for HCS H offered & adopted (Baker)--(0917H12.23H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
HS for HCS Reported Do Pass H Legislative Review
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
HS for HCS Voted Do Pass H Legislative Review
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Referred H Fiscal Review Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Referred H Legislative Review
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
HCS Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
HCS Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Committee Vote Reconsidered
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
HCS Voted Do Not Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
HCS Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Tax Reform
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
HCS Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Tax Reform
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Hearing Conducted H Special Committee on Tax Reform
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Referred H Special Committee on Tax Reform
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
H Second Read
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
H First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
S Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Perfected
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
SS#2 for SCS S offered & adopted (Koenig)--(0917S.07F)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
SS for SCS S withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Schroer)--(0917S06.07S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
SS for SCS S offered (Koenig)--(0917S.06F)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Reported from S Local Government and Elections Committee w/SCS
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
SCS Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee (0917S.04C)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2023
|
S First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2022
|
Prefiled
|
|
|