Senate
|
07/06/2023
|
Signed by Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Signed by House Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
S concurs in HCS (Bernskoetter)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
S Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
H Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
HCS H adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
HCS Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
HCS Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Referred H Fiscal Review Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
HCS Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Tourism
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
HCS Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Tourism
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Hearing Conducted H Special Committee on Tourism
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Hearing Cancelled H Special Committee on Tourism
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Referred H Special Committee on Tourism
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
H Second Read
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
H First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Second Read and Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
S First Read
|
|
|