House
|
05/12/2023
|
H Calendar Senate Joint Resolutions for Third Reading (In Fiscal Review)
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Referred H Fiscal Review Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Reported Do Pass H Rules - Regulatory Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Voted Do Pass H Rules - Regulatory Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Referred H Rules - Regulatory Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Reported Do Pass H Ways and Means
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Voted Do Pass H Ways and Means
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Hearing Conducted H Ways and Means
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred H Ways and Means
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
H Second Read
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
H First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
S Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Perfected
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Reported from S General Laws Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Re-referred S General Laws Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
Second Read and Referred S Governmental Accountability Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2023
|
S First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2022
|
Prefiled
|
|
|