House
|
05/30/2023
|
Delivered to Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
Signed by House Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
H Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Referred H Fiscal Review Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported Do Pass H Children and Families
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Voted Do Pass H Children and Families
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Hearing Conducted H Children and Families
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Referred H Children and Families
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
H Second Read
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
H First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
S Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Perfected
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Hearing Conducted S Fiscal Oversight Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
Second Read and Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2023
|
S First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2022
|
Prefiled
|
|
|