House | 04/24/2023 | Voted Do Not Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Tax Reform | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Tax Reform | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Hearing Conducted H Special Committee on Tax Reform | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Referred H Special Committee on Tax Reform | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | H Second Read | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | H First Read | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | S Third Read and Passed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Perfected | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Reported from S Economic Development and Tax Policy Committee | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Voted Do Pass S Economic Development and Tax Policy Committee | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Hearing Conducted S Economic Development and Tax Policy Committee | ||
Senate | 01/19/2023 | Second Read and Referred S Economic Development and Tax Policy Committee | ||
Senate | 01/04/2023 | S First Read | ||
Senate | 12/29/2022 | Prefiled |