Missouri 2024 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB1427 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 6, 2024
Fiscal Note February 23, 2024
Bill December 1, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis March 7, 2024
Bill March 5, 2024
Analysis December 7, 2023