House
|
04/10/2024
|
Placed on Informal Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Reported Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Executive Session Held (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Executive Session Scheduled - Tuesday, April 2, 2024, 1:45 p.m., Senate Lounge
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, March 14, 2024, 8:00 a.m., Senate Lounge.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Second read and referred: Governmental Accountability(S)
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Read First Time (S)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Delivered to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 113 NOES: 39 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 4 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Referred: Fiscal Review(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Perfected (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2024
|
Referred: Workforce and Infrastructure Development(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2024
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/03/2024
|
Read First Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
12/01/2023
|
Prefiled (H)
|
|
|