Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Executive Session Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Executive Session Scheduled - AMENDED 1 - Wednesday, April 10, 2024, 11:00 a.m., Senate Lounge.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 2, 2024, 12:00 p.m., Senate Lounge.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Second read and referred: Veterans, Military Affairs and Pensions(S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 151 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Perfected (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Referred: Rules - Regulatory Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Referred: Veterans(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2024
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/03/2024
|
Read First Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
12/01/2023
|
Prefiled (H)
|
|
|