Senate | 03/28/2024 | Second read and referred: Governmental Accountability(S) | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 100 NOES: 46 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Perfected (H) | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Title of Bill - Agreed To | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Referred: Special Committee on Government Accountability(H) | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/03/2024 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 12/01/2023 | Prefiled (H) |