House | 05/07/2024 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 05/07/2024 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Referred: Special Committee on Government Accountability(H) | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/03/2024 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 12/01/2023 | Prefiled (H) |