House | 05/09/2024 | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 04/24/2024 | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 4 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Action Postponed (H) | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Executive Session Continued | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 18 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 1 | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H) | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/03/2024 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 12/01/2023 | Prefiled (H) |