Missouri 2024 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB1713 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 8, 2024
Fiscal Note March 6, 2024
Fiscal Note January 4, 2024
Bill December 4, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 6, 2024

Substitute

Bill May 8, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis March 7, 2024
Analysis February 29, 2024
Analysis January 2, 2024