House | 02/22/2024 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 19 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Action Postponed (H) | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Executive Session Continued | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 01/05/2024 | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H) | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/03/2024 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 12/05/2023 | Prefiled (H) |