House | 05/08/2024 | Placed Back on Third Reading Calendar (H) | ||
House | 05/02/2024 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 05/02/2024 | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) | ||
House | 05/02/2024 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 05/02/2024 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 04/30/2024 | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) | ||
House | 04/29/2024 | Perfected (H) | ||
House | 04/29/2024 | HCS Adopted (H) | ||
House | 04/29/2024 | Title of Bill - Agreed To | ||
House | 04/29/2024 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 04/10/2024 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 4 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 1 | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Action Postponed (H) | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Executive Session Continued | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 21 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Referred: Special Committee on Property Tax Reform(H) | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/03/2024 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 12/12/2023 | Prefiled (H) |