House | 05/16/2024 | Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H) | ||
House | 05/01/2024 | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 04/24/2024 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/24/2024 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/24/2024 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Referred: General Laws(H) | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/03/2024 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 12/19/2023 | Prefiled (H) |