Senate
|
07/12/2024
|
Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2024
|
Approved by Governor (G)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Signed by President Pro Tem (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Signed by House Speaker (H)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Senate Message (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 29 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
SS Withdrawn (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
SS Offered
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Placed on Informal Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Reported Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Executive Session Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, March 26, 2024, 10:00 a.m., Senate Lounge
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Second read and referred: Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment(S)
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 127 NOES: 24 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Perfected (H) - AYES: 125 NOES: 16 PRESENT: 9
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2024
|
Referred: Utilities(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2024
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/03/2024
|
Read First Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
12/20/2023
|
Prefiled (H)
|
|
|