House | 04/22/2024 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/22/2024 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/22/2024 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Re-referred to Committee: Rules - Regulatory Oversight(H) | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Action Postponed (H) | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Executive Session Continued | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Referred: Transportation Accountability(H) | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/03/2024 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 12/20/2023 | Prefiled (H) |