House | 04/22/2024 | Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S) | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Read First Time (S) | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Delivered to the Senate | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 101 NOES: 37 PRESENT: 5 | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 to HA 1 and HA 1, as amended, adopted | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | HCS Adopted (H) | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Title of Bill - Agreed To | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 1 | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H) | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/03/2024 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 01/02/2024 | Prefiled (H) |