House | 05/02/2024 | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/26/2024 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 03/26/2024 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Referred: Rules - Regulatory Oversight(H) | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Referred: Special Committee on Innovation and Technology(H) | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/03/2024 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 01/02/2024 | Prefiled (H) |