House | 05/02/2024 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 05/02/2024 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 05/02/2024 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 04/30/2024 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Referred: Pensions(H) | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/03/2024 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 01/02/2024 | Prefiled (H) |