Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
Executive Session Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 23, 2024, 9:30 a.m., SCR 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Second read and referred: Emerging Issues(S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 86 NOES: 56 PRESENT: 3
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Referred: Fiscal Review(H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2024
|
Referred: Rural Community Development(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2024
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/03/2024
|
Read First Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/02/2024
|
Prefiled (H)
|
|
|