House | 03/13/2024 | Action Postponed (H) | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Executive Session Continued | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Referred: Insurance Policy(H) | ||
House | 01/05/2024 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |